9258 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF00268 | AUBRE DUTTON | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORP. vs AUBRE DUTTON | |||||||||
14CVF00415 | MARC J DELEO | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs MARC J DELEO | |||||||||
14CVF00448 | AHMED T. SALMAN | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs AHMED T. SALMAN | |||||||||
14CVF00527 | VANESSA ANGEL | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs VANESSA ANGEL | |||||||||
14CVF00534 | OBIE PARMLEY | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONEBANK (USA), N.A. vs OBIE PARMLEY | |||||||||
14CVG00414 | DENNIS HALEY | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
AH4R-OH, LLC vs DENNIS HALEY | |||||||||
06CVH00752 | ANGELA MOORE | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
MRC RECEIVABL CORP vs ANGELA MOORE | |||||||||
14CVF00231 | JEFFERY D. BARRETT | 6/10/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs JEFFERY D. BARRETT | |||||||||
14CVF00434 | TERESA MILLER | 6/5/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs TERESA MILLER | |||||||||
14CVF00464 | NICHOL BOYKIN | 6/5/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs NICHOL BOYKIN | |||||||||
14CVG00564 | ROBERT SIMPSON | 6/4/2014 | |||||||
ESTATE OF HAZEL CARTER C/O BETTY CREECH vs ROBERT SIMPSON | |||||||||
04CVF01457 | JESSICA M MCCAFFREY | 6/3/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC vs JESSICA M MCCAFFREY | |||||||||
13CVG01322 | DUSTIN SHIFFLETT, ET AL | 6/3/2014 | |||||||
MAKAN PROPERTIES LLC vs DUSTIN SHIFFLETT, ET AL | |||||||||
08CVH01203 | WILLIE HERRING | 6/3/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs WILLIE HERRING | |||||||||
14CVI00483 | DBA SUPERIOR AUTO SALES JEFF MARSH | 6/3/2014 | |||||||
MICHAEL LONG vs DBA SUPERIOR AUTO SALES JEFF MARSH | |||||||||
14CVI00583 | DAYTON DUTCH LIONS LLC | 6/3/2014 | |||||||
NICHOLAS CERVI vs DAYTON DUTCH LIONS LLC | |||||||||
14CVF00028 | TIFFANY TINGLE | 6/2/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC vs TIFFANY TINGLE | |||||||||
14CVF00070 | AMANDA SARBER | 6/2/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs AMANDA SARBER | |||||||||
14CVF00221 | JOSEPH M FOUST | 6/2/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs JOSEPH M FOUST | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 461, 462, 463 |