Daily Law Journal
4366 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2014CVR00813 WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APARTMENTS 9/26/2014
ALONA S REED vs WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APARTMENTS
2011CVF00295 DEBRA ANN WOODS AKA DEBORAH A WOODS AKA DEBORAH A ... 9/26/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FORMERLY KNOWN AS CAPITAL ONE BANK vs DEBRA ANN WOODS AKA D...
2014CVG00790 AMANDA MORRIS 9/25/2014
KAY E REAVER vs AMANDA MORRIS
2014CVG00793 KENNETH KEGLEY AND RACHEL KEGLEY 9/25/2014
PENN GARDEN APARTMENTS vs KENNETH KEGLEY and RACHEL KEGLEY
2014CVH00758 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR BMV 9/25/2014
KEITH ADAMS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR BMV
2014CVG00811 PRESTON A FOX 9/25/2014
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES, INC vs PRESTON A FOX
2014CVG00812 RONNETTE CURTIS, ET AL 9/24/2014
CARDINAL ONE PORTFOLIO, LLC DBA ALBRIGHT APTS. AKA MEADOWLARK APARTMENTS vs RONNETTE ...
2014CVG00067 FALLON EVANS 9/24/2014
VINCENT RONO vs FALLON EVANS
2014CVG00827 PAMELA K BOWEN 9/24/2014
HOWARD ABLE vs PAMELA K BOWEN
2014CVG00830 COURTNEY DAVIS 9/24/2014
DEBRA NORMAN vs COURTNEY DAVIS
2014CVG00826 LAURA RIDLEY, ET AL 9/24/2014
1763 SHILOH LLC DBA PEPZEE REALTY OF OHIO, LLC vs LAURA RIDLEY, ET AL
2014CVH00801 MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BMV STATE OF OHIO 9/23/2014
GARY COLLINS vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BMV STATE OF OHIO
2013CVF00933 BILBREY CONSTRUCTION, INC AND RICHARD L CARR, ESQ.... 9/23/2014
PHILLIPS COMPANIES vs BILBREY CONSTRUCTION, INC and RICHARD L CARR, ESQ....
2014CVG00819 TIAYON BROWN, ET AL AND JOYA BROOKS, ET AL 9/22/2014
LATOSHA CORE vs TIAYON BROWN, ET AL and JOYA BROOKS, ET AL
2014CVG00820 DEENA JOHNSON, ET AL 9/22/2014
EVA J EMICK vs DEENA JOHNSON, ET AL
2014CVG00823 MELISSA STRINGFIELD AND VICTORIA CARMICHAEL, ET AL... 9/22/2014
EARL CHILDERS vs MELISSA STRINGFIELD and VICTORIA CARMICHAEL, ET AL...
2012CVF00954 TERON BARNES 9/22/2014
OKINUS CREDIT SOLUTIONS vs TERON BARNES
2014CVG00698 WILLIE HARRIS 9/22/2014
BEARCREEK FARMS, INC. vs WILLIE HARRIS
2014CVG00815 DIONNE HEFLIN, ET AL 9/22/2014
3 W. SUNRISE PROP., LLC. (OWNER) vs DIONNE HEFLIN, ET AL

1, 2, 3 ... 217, 218, 219  Next