Daily Law Journal
5373 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2014CVG00269 ANDREW W BREWER AND RAMSEY BREWER 4/17/2014
SCOTT H FRIESZELL vs ANDREW W BREWER and RAMSEY BREWER
2014CVG00270 CONSTANCE FREEMAN 4/17/2014
ROY F SCHROEDER vs CONSTANCE FREEMAN
2014CVI00189 MELINDA STAFFORD 4/17/2014
RONALD L COOK vs MELINDA STAFFORD
2013CVH00373 KEVIN SCHWIETERMAN AND A J SCHWIETERMAN 4/16/2014
DAN BERGMAN vs KEVIN SCHWIETERMAN and A J SCHWIETERMAN
2013CVF00700 CHRISTOPHER BENNETT AND CONSTANCE BENNETT 4/16/2014
AUTO CAR CREDIT CO INC vs CHRISTOPHER BENNETT and CONSTANCE BENNETT
2014CVI00135 TIFFANY JULIAN AND RYAN M JULIAN 4/16/2014
LEAH SMITH and MEGAN STEWART vs TIFFANY JULIAN and RYAN M JULIAN
2014CVI00051 DESHA ROSE AND BRIAN E ROSE 4/16/2014
BRADFORD J HART vs DESHA ROSE and BRIAN E ROSE
2014CVG00228 CRYSTAL FENNER AND WAYNE BINTNER 4/16/2014
MARTHA CHATTERTON vs CRYSTAL FENNER and WAYNE BINTNER
2014CVG00236 ERIC POWELL, ET AL AND AMBER HOCHADEL, ET AL 4/16/2014
JAMES S JONES vs ERIC POWELL, ET AL and AMBER HOCHADEL, ET AL
2014CVG00231 DANYELLE EDWARDS 4/16/2014
ANGELA MILLER vs DANYELLE EDWARDS
2014CVG00229 SHERRI WAGGONER, ET AL 4/16/2014
WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS vs SHERRI WAGGONER, ET AL
2014CVG00230 BRIAN PINKARD AKA BRIAN S PINKARD 4/16/2014
WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APTS. vs BRIAN PINKARD AKA BRIAN S PINKARD
2014CVG00217 TAMMY W DAVIS 4/16/2014
AH4R I OH, LLC vs TAMMY W DAVIS
2014CVH00178 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR BMV 4/15/2014
JEREMY M SIKORA vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR BMV
2014CVF00707 STEPHEN H BYRD AND ANGELA BYRD 4/14/2014
HERSCHEL PATTERSON and MICHELE PATTERSON vs STEPHEN H BYRD and ANGELA BYRD
2014CVI00227 WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APARTMENTS 4/14/2014
TARA S CAMPBELL vs WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APARTMENTS
2014CVI00081 JEFFERSON SMITH AND YEN M SMITH 4/14/2014
ALAN L FORSYTHE vs JEFFERSON SMITH and YEN M SMITH
2012CVF00455 MILTON PEARSON 4/14/2014
MATTHEW C SORG, RECEIVER vs MILTON PEARSON
2014CVF00193 ERNIE L STONE 4/11/2014
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs ERNIE L STONE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 116, 117, 118 ... 267, 268, 269  Next