17377 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00878Â W | TERRY GEKELER CONTRACTING LLC | 9/16/2021 | |||||||
TIMOTHY NEARGARDER vs TERRY GEKELER CONTRACTING LLC | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00591Â W | KENSINGTON SQUARE APTS | 9/16/2021 | |||||||
SONYA L JONES vs KENSINGTON SQUARE APTS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00977Â W | DAWHN JEFFERSON | 9/16/2021 | |||||||
1591 AZALEA, LLC vs DAWHN JEFFERSON | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 01062Â E | PATRICIA GRESHAM | 9/15/2021 | |||||||
HARBOR GROUP MANAGEMENT vs PATRICIA GRESHAM | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 01063Â E | JEFFREY BROWN | 9/15/2021 | |||||||
HARBOR GROUP MANAGEMENT vs JEFFREY BROWN | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 01064Â E | JACOB HUEY AND MAKENZIE NORDYKE | 9/15/2021 | |||||||
HARBOR GROUP MANAGEMENT vs JACOB HUEY and MAKENZIE NORDYKE | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 01049Â E | LEONA J JONES | 9/15/2021 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs LEONA J JONES | |||||||||
2021Â CVRÂ 00870Â W | WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS | 9/13/2021 | |||||||
SANOVA YATES vs WINGATE AT BELLE MEADOWS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00949Â W | JESSICA AUSTIN | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES FOR CK-HP SALEM WOODS HOLDINGS vs JESSICA AUSTIN | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 01134Â W | EDGAR R HOOVER AND MELISSA K DUNKLE AND JOHN OR JA... | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
WOLFCREEK TROTWOOD LLC, vs EDGAR R HOOVER and MELISSA K DUNKLE and JOHN OR JA... | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00864Â W | THADDIUS CORE | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
KELLI JEFFERY vs THADDIUS CORE | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00959Â W | CRYSTAL FLETCHER | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
WILLIAM J WHITE vs CRYSTAL FLETCHER | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00953Â W | RONSHAE NOOKS | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC. vs RONSHAE NOOKS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00952Â W | JOANN PROCTOR | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
CIRO RIVERA vs JOANN PROCTOR | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00948Â W | CHRIS STRIKE | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
JOEL JOHNSON vs CHRIS STRIKE | |||||||||
2017Â CVFÂ 00535Â W | MARYE C OLIVER | 9/9/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MARYE C OLIVER | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00822Â E | CAROL ANN WAGNER | 9/8/2021 | |||||||
MICHAEL BUTLER vs CAROL ANN WAGNER | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00768Â E | JOSHUA HARKINS | 9/8/2021 | |||||||
JUDY MORELAND vs JOSHUA HARKINS | |||||||||
2021Â CVFÂ 00246Â E | DALE VANNOY | 9/8/2021 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs DALE VANNOY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 245, 246, 247 ... 867, 868, 869 Next |