17460 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2021Â CVFÂ 00332Â E | 8/4/2021 | ||||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00657Â W | SHATYRA STARK | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON SINGLE FAMILY HOMES DBA JEFFERSON RESIDENCE vs SHATYRA STARK | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00798Â W | KEONA M JOLLY | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs KEONA M JOLLY | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00799Â W | ANDREW LEWIS | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
RFMILLER HOMES LTD vs ANDREW LEWIS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00802Â W | JEFFREY BOWMAN AND TRACEY BOWMAN | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
COMTECH REALTY, LLC vs JEFFREY BOWMAN and TRACEY BOWMAN | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00600Â W | CHARLES STEWART | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
DUANE TAYLOR vs CHARLES STEWART | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00687Â W | THEODORE SOMERSET | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
MONIQUE FREEMAN vs THEODORE SOMERSET | |||||||||
2021Â CVFÂ 00280Â W | JONISTA M PEEBLES | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JONISTA M PEEBLES | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01262Â W | CHARKAY S ALLEN | 7/29/2021 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs CHARKAY S ALLEN | |||||||||
2021 CVG 00863 E | CIERA STANLEY | 7/28/2021 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST LLC vs CIERA STANLEY | |||||||||
2021 CVG 00880 E | ZACHARY WHITEAKER AND ABBY LEE CUNNINGHAM | 7/28/2021 | |||||||
ALICE V ANDERSON vs ZACHARY WHITEAKER AND ABBY LEE CUNNINGHAM | |||||||||
2021 CVG 00868 E | LUCILLE SUTTON | 7/28/2021 | |||||||
ROBIN SUTTON AND ALAN TAULEE vs LUCILLE SUTTON | |||||||||
2020 CVF 01041 E | RON STOVER | 7/28/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RON STOVER | |||||||||
2021 CVR 00603 W | RPM MIDWEST | 7/26/2021 | |||||||
JAVONTE REED vs RPM MIDWEST | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00554Â W | WILLIE GARVINS | 7/22/2021 | |||||||
3303 SHILOH SPRINGS RD TROTWOOD OH LLC vs WILLIE GARVINS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00704Â W | CIERRA MINOR | 7/22/2021 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA vs CIERRA MINOR | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00736Â W | PAUL T HORTON | 7/22/2021 | |||||||
LAWRENCE E DOWLER vs PAUL T HORTON | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00741Â W | MARCUS HILL AND LAJUAN TUCKER | 7/22/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR vs MARCUS HILL and LAJUAN TUCKER | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00742Â W | JESSICA HERNANDEZ | 7/22/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR vs JESSICA HERNANDEZ | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 260, 261, 262 ... 871, 872, 873 Next |