17502 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00242Â W | TINA DOBRNIECKL | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
WILLIAM MCWAIN vs TINA DOBRNIECKL | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00273Â W | TRAVIS MAYS | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
LANGLEY ROUCH and SHARA RAUCH vs TRAVIS MAYS | |||||||||
2021Â CVIÂ 00027Â W | NATNAILE ASHENAFI | 4/22/2021 | |||||||
INDIA HUGER vs NATNAILE ASHENAFI | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00383Â E | STEPHEN HODGE | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
KELECHIJ BRERETON vs STEPHEN HODGE | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00384Â E | CHARLENE HASTON | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
MIKE MCMAHAN vs CHARLENE HASTON | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 01381Â E | EDWARD WRIGHT | 4/21/2021 | |||||||
MYKA MARLOWE vs EDWARD WRIGHT | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01077Â W | JUANITA ROBINSON | 4/19/2021 | |||||||
JERRY JACKSON vs JUANITA ROBINSON | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00333Â W | JONNIE WATSON | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES LLC vs JONNIE WATSON | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00336Â W | SHATYRA STARK | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON SINGLE FAMILY HOMES vs SHATYRA STARK | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00335Â W | SHAWNIQUE MARTIN-HICKS | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON SINGLE FAMILY HOMES vs SHAWNIQUE MARTIN-HICKS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00334Â W | TERSA BAKER | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES LLC vs TERSA BAKER | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00332Â W | JESSICA MEDEROS | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA vs JESSICA MEDEROS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00320Â W | ASHLEY ANKER | 4/15/2021 | |||||||
RONALD HEDGER vs ASHLEY ANKER | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00870Â E | ROSEMARIE CHEEKS | 4/14/2021 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ROSEMARIE CHEEKS | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00334Â E | LISA GINTER | 4/14/2021 | |||||||
PENN GARDEN APARTMENTS vs LISA GINTER | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00335Â E | DANIEL ZUG | 4/14/2021 | |||||||
PENN GARDEN APARTMENTS vs DANIEL ZUG | |||||||||
2021Â CVGÂ 00341Â E | DEMICA R MURPH | 4/14/2021 | |||||||
NORCLIFFE OHIO, LP vs DEMICA R MURPH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 281, 282, 283 ... 874, 875, 876 Next |