17443 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00980Â E | BAKIDEN GORDON | 12/28/2020 | |||||||
EVANS CONCRETE CONST. & LANDSCAPE, LLC vs BAKIDEN GORDON | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01136Â W | LEANNA LAWSON AND JAYSON RETICH | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
CIRO RIVERA vs LEANNA LAWSON and JAYSON RETICH | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01156Â W | MARITZA CONCEPTCION | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
IVAN KATZ vs MARITZA CONCEPTCION | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01225Â W | MATHEW PERRY | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
ELIZABETH DAWKINS vs MATHEW PERRY | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01218Â W | ADRIENNE ALLEN | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
MARTHA CHATTERTON vs ADRIENNE ALLEN | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01208Â W | LAKYIA PARKS | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES AGENT FOR vs LAKYIA PARKS | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01207Â W | SHERRI DAVIS | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
DAYTON SINGLE FAMILY HOMES vs SHERRI DAVIS | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01206Â W | ALYAH RILEY | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC vs ALYAH RILEY | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01205Â W | NECHE CRAWFORD | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC vs NECHE CRAWFORD | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01204Â W | AALIYAH JACKSON | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC vs AALIYAH JACKSON | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01203Â W | EDWARD MCGEE | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC vs EDWARD MCGEE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01202Â W | LAWANDA JOHNSON | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
GATED PROPERTIES VII, LLC vs LAWANDA JOHNSON | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01192Â W | ANTAUN KINNEY | 12/24/2020 | |||||||
FRIEDMAN REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT vs ANTAUN KINNEY | |||||||||
2020Â CVRÂ 01187Â E | ANNE COSSABOON AND RODNEY COSSABOON | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
KEISHA LYLES vs ANNE COSSABOON and RODNEY COSSABOON | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01330Â E | COURTNEY KIMBROUGH | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
GLENBURN GREEN COOPERATIVE INC vs COURTNEY KIMBROUGH | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 01331Â E | DANIEL COLLINS AND LAURA COLLINS | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
INDEPENDENCE PROPERTY MGMT vs DANIEL COLLINS and LAURA COLLINS | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00933Â E | WILLIAM TREVINO | 12/23/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs WILLIAM TREVINO | |||||||||
2020Â CVHÂ 01211Â W | MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
RESIDENT vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00724Â W | ERICA PERNELL AND AL MYLES | 12/21/2020 | |||||||
ERIC W CRAIG vs ERICA PERNELL and AL MYLES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 299, 300, 301 ... 871, 872, 873 Next |