17436 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00102Â W | 8/13/2020 | ||||||||
JESSIE STINSON vs | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00483Â W | SYLVIA MOORE | 8/13/2020 | |||||||
CANDACE TUBBS vs SYLVIA MOORE | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00592Â E | LEWIS COLLINS | 8/12/2020 | |||||||
BRANTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOC., INC. vs LEWIS COLLINS | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00963Â E | BRUCE D CHRISTIAN | 8/12/2020 | |||||||
NATIONAL AUTO ACCEPTANCE CORP. vs BRUCE D CHRISTIAN | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00832Â E | ELEDA MANNING | 8/12/2020 | |||||||
ROBERT AHMAD vs ELEDA MANNING | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00608Â E | DONASIA MORRIS | 8/12/2020 | |||||||
RODNEY COSSABOON vs DONASIA MORRIS | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00780Â E | TAMMY KIMBROUGH | 8/12/2020 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs TAMMY KIMBROUGH | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00606Â E | JEFFREY MURPHY AND TYLER MURPHY | 8/10/2020 | |||||||
CHARLES EVANS and GLENDA EVANS vs JEFFREY MURPHY and TYLER MURPHY | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00674Â W | STEVEN OCONNOR | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY HOUSING OPPORTUNITIES FOR vs STEVEN OCONNOR | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00325Â W | CHARICE M MCNEIL | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs CHARICE M MCNEIL | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00468Â W | SHARON K MORRIS | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS, LLC vs SHARON K MORRIS | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00610Â W | AMBER E MANCEAU | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
CHAD E FLINT vs AMBER E MANCEAU | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00519Â W | OLUWATOOWO OLOJEDE | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
ALANA WARD vs OLUWATOOWO OLOJEDE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00653Â W | RICHARD ALLEN DOGGETT AND FREEMAN COLLETTA DAI | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
SHLOMO AMITAY vs RICHARD ALLEN DOGGETT and FREEMAN COLLETTA DAI | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00679Â W | TRACY MITCHELL AND SARAH MITCHELL | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC. vs TRACY MITCHELL and SARAH MITCHELL | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00678Â W | CHARLOTTE BRICE | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
3303 SHILOH SPRINGS ROAD TROTWOOD OH, LLC vs CHARLOTTE BRICE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00673Â W | KENYA MOORE | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
BRIAN BARRETT and KRISHNA HODGE BARRETT vs KENYA MOORE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00623Â W | DONALD MAHORNEY | 8/6/2020 | |||||||
RONALD WILLIAMS vs DONALD MAHORNEY | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00372Â E | ROBERT MUNSTER | 8/5/2020 | |||||||
LOIS N BIRDSONG vs ROBERT MUNSTER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 324, 325, 326 ... 870, 871, 872 Next |