17460 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00275Â E | DENZIL NORROD AND JOSH NORROD | 7/22/2020 | |||||||
ANNETTIA HULTON and ALICE REYNOLDS vs DENZIL NORROD and JOSH NORROD | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00364Â W | ANDRE K PIERCE AND FREDERICK R ARMSTRONG | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC SUCESSOR vs ANDRE K PIERCE and FREDERICK R ARMSTRONG | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 01400Â W | SAUNDRA A SCOTT | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs SAUNDRA A SCOTT | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00201Â W | SHARON K MORRIS | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENT, LLC vs SHARON K MORRIS | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 01219Â W | JOSEPH LAFORSCH | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
NICHOLAS E NEAD and vs JOSEPH LAFORSCH | |||||||||
2020Â CVRÂ 00517Â W | BELLE MEADOWS | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
WESLEY MCWHORTER vs BELLE MEADOWS | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00618Â W | TIONNA ALLEN | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA BELLE MEADOWS SU vs TIONNA ALLEN | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00616Â W | WILLIAM ARMOR AND GERALDINE ARMOR | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
THE ESTATE OF DAVID L PARKS vs WILLIAM ARMOR and GERALDINE ARMOR | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00615Â W | TRAVON JONES AND CHANIK FIELDS | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
THE ESTATE OF DAVID L PARKS vs TRAVON JONES and CHANIK FIELDS | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00612Â W | SHAWANNA WEBSTER | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH LLC vs SHAWANNA WEBSTER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00605Â W | LAMIKA BYRD AND MARY BYRD | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
FIRST REALTY GROUP, LTD vs LAMIKA BYRD and MARY BYRD | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00604Â W | RONALD L HORN AND BRIANNA T GARNER | 7/16/2020 | |||||||
TERESA GARNER vs RONALD L HORN and BRIANNA T GARNER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00749Â E | KEISHA M FREDRICK | 7/15/2020 | |||||||
PATRICK WHITTAKER and LISA WHITTAKER vs KEISHA M FREDRICK | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00751Â E | JESSICA WEBB | 7/15/2020 | |||||||
MARQUETTA FULTON and JAMES M BURNETT vs JESSICA WEBB | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00732Â E | WHITNEY DURDEN | 7/15/2020 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs WHITNEY DURDEN | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00750Â E | MAURICE POWELL | 7/15/2020 | |||||||
HOME EXPERTS REALTY, LLC vs MAURICE POWELL | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00683Â E | AURORA GARCIA | 7/13/2020 | |||||||
DAYTON ESTATES MPH LLC vs AURORA GARCIA | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00688Â E | CLINTON PIERCE | 7/13/2020 | |||||||
DAYTON ESTATES MPH LLC vs CLINTON PIERCE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00694Â E | DONALD MOSS | 7/13/2020 | |||||||
DAYTON ESTATES MPH LLC vs DONALD MOSS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 328, 329, 330 ... 871, 872, 873 Next |