17460 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00730Â E | BRYAN TINSLEY | 7/8/2020 | |||||||
AFFINITY REALLY LLC vs BRYAN TINSLEY | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00183Â E | RON STOVER | 7/8/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RON STOVER | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00573Â E | THOMAS P FLAHIVE | 7/8/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs THOMAS P FLAHIVE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00681Â E | KAYCEE N DULCEAK | 7/8/2020 | |||||||
LORRIC REALTY LLC DBA VIC GREEN REALTY vs KAYCEE N DULCEAK | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00241Â W | RODNEY WRIGHT | 7/6/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O vs RODNEY WRIGHT | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00518Â W | HYSLOPE MASONARY MAINTENANCE CO | 7/6/2020 | |||||||
JANICE L GUNN vs HYSLOPE MASONARY MAINTENANCE CO | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00484Â W | ALANA HUMPHREY AND DIONNE PERRY | 7/6/2020 | |||||||
ANDREA M PHELPS vs ALANA HUMPHREY and DIONNE PERRY | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00483Â W | SYLVIA MOORE | 7/6/2020 | |||||||
CANDACE TUBBS vs SYLVIA MOORE | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00396Â W | MONIQUE N FREEMAN | 7/6/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC C/O LEVY & vs MONIQUE N FREEMAN | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00208Â W | DENNIS TAYLOR | 7/6/2020 | |||||||
INSIGHT CAPITAL, LLC vs DENNIS TAYLOR | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00557Â W | BRANDON HASSELL | 7/2/2020 | |||||||
PENNINGTON HOMES, INC. vs BRANDON HASSELL | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00568Â W | TODD MANGEOT | 7/2/2020 | |||||||
CHUCK WRIGHT and FREDA WRIGHT vs TODD MANGEOT | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 01274Â W | EDWARD M CHICKETTI AND | 7/2/2020 | |||||||
SPECIALTY INSURANCE LTD vs EDWARD M CHICKETTI and | |||||||||
2020Â CVRÂ 00517Â W | BELLE MEADOWS | 7/2/2020 | |||||||
WESLEY MCWHORTER vs BELLE MEADOWS | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00278Â E | RONALD BOWLING | 7/1/2020 | |||||||
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES, INC. vs RONALD BOWLING | |||||||||
2020Â CVFÂ 00312Â E | LEOLA HONEAS | 7/1/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs LEOLA HONEAS | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 01006Â E | KIMBERLEY BROWN | 6/29/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs KIMBERLEY BROWN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 330, 331, 332 ... 871, 872, 873 Next |