17502 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 01242Â E | DANNY MULLINS | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDL vs DANNY MULLINS | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00378Â E | BRADLEY R MARSH | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs BRADLEY R MARSH | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00253Â E | OMAR ELDADAH | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
GOLD KEY REALTY vs OMAR ELDADAH | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00254Â E | JULIO TORREZ | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
MATTHEW C SORG vs JULIO TORREZ | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00255Â E | DIORI BOATMAN | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
JAMES LAVOY vs DIORI BOATMAN | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00890Â E | LEEANN JORDAN | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LEEANN JORDAN | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 01794Â E | AMBER WATSON | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDL vs AMBER WATSON | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00202Â E | MICHELLE SCHNECK | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
TOM R SWANK vs MICHELLE SCHNECK | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00331Â E | DAVID S SHAVER | 3/2/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC INC vs DAVID S SHAVER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00183Â W | TINA HALL | 2/27/2020 | |||||||
MALISSA PATTERSON POA FOR MARCIA SMITH vs TINA HALL | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00187Â W | AYSHA WALTON | 2/27/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC. vs AYSHA WALTON | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00186Â W | KORI BELL | 2/27/2020 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP vs KORI BELL | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00185Â W | JOHN SWINDLE JR | 2/27/2020 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP vs JOHN SWINDLE JR | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00184Â W | TWAUNTE KNIGHT | 2/27/2020 | |||||||
3303 SHILOH SPRINGS ROAD TROTWOOD OH, LLC vs TWAUNTE KNIGHT | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00182Â W | BRENDA BUSH AND PHILLIP MOSSES | 2/27/2020 | |||||||
3303 SHILOH SPRINGS ROAD TROTWOOD OH, LLC vs BRENDA BUSH and PHILLIP MOSSES | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00247Â E | JERRIOT THOMAS AND COURTNEY BELCHER | 2/26/2020 | |||||||
NPLH PROPERTIES, LLC vs JERRIOT THOMAS and COURTNEY BELCHER | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00089Â E | JOE APPLEGARTH AND MONIC APPLEGARTH | 2/26/2020 | |||||||
ROBERT PANTALL vs JOE APPLEGARTH and MONIC APPLEGARTH | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 01718Â W | DANIEL COX | 2/25/2020 | |||||||
CANDIS BRUCE and RYAN BYRD vs DANIEL COX | |||||||||
2020Â CVIÂ 00003Â E | RICHARD DOWLING | 2/24/2020 | |||||||
LINDSAY WILLIAMS vs RICHARD DOWLING | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 346, 347, 348 ... 874, 875, 876 Next |