17502 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00194Â E | DANA MURPHY | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DANA MURPHY | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 01072Â W | STEPHANIE A BEASLEY | 1/28/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs STEPHANIE A BEASLEY | |||||||||
2019Â CVEÂ 01719Â E | WAL-MART INC. AND OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID | 1/27/2020 | |||||||
ANTHONY M ROQUE and ELVIRA MEJIA vs WAL-MART INC. and OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00042Â W | QUENTIN MANNING AND DOROTHY MANNING | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
KERRI BORCHERS vs QUENTIN MANNING and DOROTHY MANNING | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00706Â W | PATTI THURMAN AND | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
SCOTT BELYEU vs PATTI THURMAN and | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00011Â W | DYESHA DIXON | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs DYESHA DIXON | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00010Â W | VEDA PALMER | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES, LLC. vs VEDA PALMER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00009Â W | ANGELA IHEANACHO | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ANGELA IHEANACHO | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00008Â W | PAULASHIA PACKNETT | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
BELLE MEADOWS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA BELLE MEADOWS SU vs PAULASHIA PACKNETT | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00007Â W | THEODIS SLOAN | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP DBA WINGATE AT BELLE vs THEODIS SLOAN | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00006Â W | TRAVELL MCCARTY | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP DBA WINGATE AT BELLE vs TRAVELL MCCARTY | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00005Â W | KEVIN GRANGER | 1/23/2020 | |||||||
KAREN WAMPLER, POA FOR DOROTHY AND JACK vs KEVIN GRANGER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00009Â E | AUDREY LOCKHART | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
COMTECH REALTY, LLC, AGENT FOR WELLER MORTGAGE, IN vs AUDREY LOCKHART | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00018Â E | MICHAEL W ROSE AND MARETTA S ROSE | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
ERIC J OPPERMAN vs MICHAEL W ROSE and MARETTA S ROSE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00019Â E | CHANCEY ROOKWOOD | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
CHRIS JURGENS vs CHANCEY ROOKWOOD | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00020Â E | RUTH HOSTETTER | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs RUTH HOSTETTER | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00021Â E | STEVEN WENDLING | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs STEVEN WENDLING | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00022Â E | APRIL ARNETT BRICKLES AND TYLER LEE | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
JOYCE ARNETT vs APRIL ARNETT BRICKLES and TYLER LEE | |||||||||
2020Â CVGÂ 00047Â E | RONALD A WEST | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
GONZALO RAMOS vs RONALD A WEST | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 353, 354, 355 ... 874, 875, 876 Next |