17436 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00980Â W | AKIMA WILLIAMS | 8/1/2019 | |||||||
TOWNVIEW REALTY, LTD vs AKIMA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00979Â W | KAMRIE J PETERSON | 8/1/2019 | |||||||
SHREEJI REALTY, LTD. vs KAMRIE J PETERSON | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 01080Â E | JACQUELINE CROSS | 7/31/2019 | |||||||
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES, INC. vs JACQUELINE CROSS | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 01088Â E | DENNIS BODDIE | 7/31/2019 | |||||||
MIA DAVIS vs DENNIS BODDIE | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00981Â E | EDWARD HYNES | 7/31/2019 | |||||||
STEPHANIE HALL vs EDWARD HYNES | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 01676Â W | STEVEN THE MECHANIC | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
BAILEY RAYS AUTO SALES AND DETAIL vs STEVEN THE MECHANIC | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00146Â W | EVANS ARENA CRYSTLER DODGE JEEP RAM | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
LASHAWNITA GOODWIN vs EVANS ARENA CRYSTLER DODGE JEEP RAM | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 00574Â W | MARK HOLCOMB | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
ZACHARY L BOLLINGER vs MARK HOLCOMB | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00539Â W | TINITA COLE | 7/30/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs TINITA COLE | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00259Â E | NICHOLAS DEBELLO AND MISTY VILLALPANDO | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
HHR BORROWER 1 LLC vs NICHOLAS DEBELLO and MISTY VILLALPANDO | |||||||||
2019Â CVHÂ 00758Â E | ALL CREDITORS | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH vs ALL CREDITORS | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 01072Â E | CHRIS ALLEN | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
SATNAM SINGH vs CHRIS ALLEN | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 01070Â E | TYISH GAINES | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
ANNE COSSABOON vs TYISH GAINES | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00691Â E | BEVERLY J JOHNSON | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs BEVERLY J JOHNSON | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00376Â E | ANGELA HOGAN | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ANGELA HOGAN | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 01214Â E | RYAN CATHCART AND | 7/29/2019 | |||||||
JEAN A FORTUNA vs RYAN CATHCART and | |||||||||
2019Â CVRÂ 00274Â W | US REEB | 7/25/2019 | |||||||
MONIQUE CRIBBS vs US REEB | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00907Â W | SHANITA RAY | 7/25/2019 | |||||||
5920 CHAMBERSBURG, LLC vs SHANITA RAY | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00908Â W | SIERRA REDICK | 7/25/2019 | |||||||
LASOR INVESTMENTS, II, LLC vs SIERRA REDICK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 390, 391, 392 ... 870, 871, 872 Next |