17502 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00092Â W | REGINALD BEARD | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
PAMELA BEARD vs REGINALD BEARD | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00364Â W | MELISSA RAMOS AND BILLY BROWN | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
AA CRAVEN BAIL BONDS vs MELISSA RAMOS and BILLY BROWN | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00032Â W | LAYLA WARE | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
ERIC EVANS vs LAYLA WARE | |||||||||
2019Â CVFÂ 00065Â E | DANELL BOURQUIN | 4/22/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs DANELL BOURQUIN | |||||||||
2008Â CVFÂ 01186Â E | LORI GROGG | 4/22/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LORI GROGG | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00515Â E | CECELE BRANHAM AND RODNEY RATLIFF, DECEASED AND KE... | 4/22/2019 | |||||||
MARY ANN MOTZA vs CECELE BRANHAM and RODNEY RATLIFF, DECEASED and KE... | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00400Â E | SIDNEY S SIEGEL | 4/22/2019 | |||||||
KRISTOPHER NELSON vs SIDNEY S SIEGEL | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00444Â W | TED R HUBBARD AND ROSE M HUBBARD | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
ACM VISION V, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED vs TED R HUBBARD and ROSE M HUBBARD | |||||||||
2018Â CVIÂ 01721Â W | LAWRENCE MCKEE | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
JACQUELINE D FISHER vs LAWRENCE MCKEE | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00462Â W | CHRISTY BETLEY/HALSEY | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
PENNINGTON HOMES INC. vs CHRISTY BETLEY/HALSEY | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00448Â W | STEPHEN GOLDSMITH AND MEREDITH GOLDSMITH | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
PELLETIER vs STEPHEN GOLDSMITH and MEREDITH GOLDSMITH | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00447Â W | QUANISHA WILLIAMS | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs QUANISHA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00446Â W | TERRANCE COATS | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs TERRANCE COATS | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00445Â W | EBONI TURNER | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs EBONI TURNER | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00428Â W | LASHAWNA BECKHAM | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
JOINER PROPERTIES LLC EDWARD JOINER vs LASHAWNA BECKHAM | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00421Â W | GARY LAWSON AND JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
BROOKSIDE MANOR PROPERTIES vs GARY LAWSON and JOHN DOE and JANE DOE | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00420Â W | KELLY EADES | 4/18/2019 | |||||||
RIGHT CHOICE REAL ESTATE, LLC AGENT FOR vs KELLY EADES | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00506Â E | JESSICA MERRITT | 4/17/2019 | |||||||
WALLICK PROPERTIES MIDWEST LLC vs JESSICA MERRITT | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00505Â E | HARRY TAYLOR AND SHARON A TAYLOR | 4/16/2019 | |||||||
VIC GREEN REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs HARRY TAYLOR and SHARON A TAYLOR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 415, 416, 417 ... 874, 875, 876 Next |