17460 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00377Â W | EARL MATLOCK, SR | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP DBA WINGATE AT BELLE vs EARL MATLOCK, SR | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00378Â W | RHONDA WADE | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS , LP DBA WINGATE AT BELLE vs RHONDA WADE | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00380Â W | VINCENT JACKSON | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs VINCENT JACKSON | |||||||||
2019Â CVIÂ 00076Â W | CRYSTAL DEBRAUX | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
RHYLEE ANN INVESTMENTS vs CRYSTAL DEBRAUX | |||||||||
2019Â CVRÂ 00274Â W | US REEB | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
MONIQUE CRIBBS vs US REEB | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00376Â W | SHEILA DEPP | 4/4/2019 | |||||||
SHILOH SPRINGS, LP DBA WINGATE AT BELLE vs SHEILA DEPP | |||||||||
2018Â CVGÂ 01861Â E | SAMANTHA STONECIPHER | 4/3/2019 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC vs SAMANTHA STONECIPHER | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 01321Â W | EILEEN JACKSON AND LARRY JACKSON | 4/2/2019 | |||||||
GOTHAM SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC vs EILEEN JACKSON and LARRY JACKSON | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00418Â E | ROSHAWNDA S SADDLER | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
5468 BELLEFONTAINE LLC vs ROSHAWNDA S SADDLER | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00431Â E | STEPHANIE SCOTT AND SAMUEL BRODNICK | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
THE PROPERTIES AT WRIGHT FIELD, LLC vs STEPHANIE SCOTT and SAMUEL BRODNICK | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00429Â E | TERENCE HAYES JR | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
THE PROPERTIES AT WRIGHT FIELD, LLC vs TERENCE HAYES JR | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00428Â E | TRACI TAYLOR | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
FREEDOM FOR LIVING PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs TRACI TAYLOR | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00419Â E | NATHANIEL YOUNG AND ANTANARA YOUNG | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
GOLD KEY REALTY vs NATHANIEL YOUNG and ANTANARA YOUNG | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 01180Â E | CHIEF HOLLEY AND JACKIE GORDON AND CINDY GORDON | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
WAYNE MARCUM vs CHIEF HOLLEY and JACKIE GORDON and CINDY GORDON | |||||||||
2018Â CVFÂ 00128Â E | RICHARD L ALDEN | 4/1/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs RICHARD L ALDEN | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00312Â W | PATRICK HILL | 3/28/2019 | |||||||
CONREX PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AGENT FOR vs PATRICK HILL | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00322Â W | MOLLY FREEMAN | 3/28/2019 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER L HAINES vs MOLLY FREEMAN | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00357Â W | ASHINEA BALLEW-TIPTON AND DAVID JEWETT | 3/28/2019 | |||||||
LINK REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC vs ASHINEA BALLEW-TIPTON and DAVID JEWETT | |||||||||
2019Â CVGÂ 00358Â W | KAJENA BOYKIN | 3/28/2019 | |||||||
WOODLAND HILLS ASSOCIATES, LLC DBA WOODLAND HILLS vs KAJENA BOYKIN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 417, 418, 419 ... 871, 872, 873 Next |