Daily Law Journal
4164 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2013CVI01074 CHARLIE CULP 1/6/2014
JEFFERY L CARSON vs CHARLIE CULP
2013CVG01124 EDDIE BIRKINS 1/2/2014
VIC GREEN REALTY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs EDDIE BIRKINS
2013CVG01107 DENISE L HOCKEY 1/2/2014
HRE INVESTMENTS LLC vs DENISE L HOCKEY
2013CVG01108 DENNIS ADAMS AND KAMERON COLLIER AND RACHI REEVES 1/2/2014
GOLD KEY REALTY vs DENNIS ADAMS and KAMERON COLLIER and RACHI REEVES
2011CVF01215 BARBARA A CLARK 12/27/2013
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs BARBARA A CLARK
2013CVI00945 RICHARD RAVINE AND SHANNON RAVINE AND COLDWELL BAN... 12/26/2013
VERNESSA KING vs RICHARD RAVINE and SHANNON RAVINE and COLDWELL BAN...
2013CVI01017 CHRISTOPHER DURANT 12/26/2013
STEPHANIE D LEE vs CHRISTOPHER DURANT
2013CVG01092 RICHARD YOUNG LOVE AND COLLETTE JACKSON AND JOHN D... 12/26/2013
WELLS FARGO BANK, NA vs RICHARD YOUNG LOVE and COLLETTE JACKSON and JOHN D...
2013CVG01094 CHRISTINA R ALLEN AND TODD S MULLINS AND JOHN DOE ... 12/26/2013
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs CHRISTINA R ALLEN and TODD S MULLINS and JOHN DOE ...
2013CVG01093 BETTY DURHAM AND JANICE DURHAM AND JOHN DOE (UNKNO... 12/26/2013
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs BETTY DURHAM and JANICE DURHAM and JOHN DOE (UNKNO...
2013CVG01091 DANIEL E BROWN AND CHERYL KISER BROWN 12/26/2013
LINDA L FULTON vs DANIEL E BROWN and CHERYL KISER BROWN
2013CVG01096 NICHOLAS DEAN 12/26/2013
JEFFREY J MOORE and LEANNA R MOORE vs NICHOLAS DEAN
2013CVG01104 BRIAN BAIRD AND AMBER BAIRD 12/26/2013
ST VINCENT DEPAUL SUPPORTIVE HOUSING vs BRIAN BAIRD and AMBER BAIRD
2013CVG01089 IDINA COLE 12/26/2013
REALMARK CORP vs IDINA COLE
2013CVG01087 ERICA MARTIN 12/26/2013
REALMARK CORP vs ERICA MARTIN
2013CVG01088 DENNIS SANDERS AND TOTANY R JONES 12/26/2013
REALMARK CORP vs DENNIS SANDERS and TOTANY R JONES
2013CVG01090 MICHELLE LAVERNE 12/26/2013
REALMARK CORP. C/O WAYNE ESTATES vs MICHELLE LAVERNE
2012CVF01159 JENNIFER GRETH AKA JENNIFER K. GRETH AKA JENNIFER ... 12/23/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JENNIFER GRETH AKA JENNIFER K. GRET...
2013CVG01066 JUANITA BOGLE ET AL 12/23/2013
EQUICORP REALTY, INC. vs JUANITA BOGLE ET AL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 48, 49, 50 ... 207, 208, 209  Next