19232 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST00834 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES LAWSON | 5/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00905 | THE ESTATE OF DAIVD STOUTENBOROUGH | 5/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00909 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH HOWARD | 5/14/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00728 | THE ESTATE OF TEDDY FREEMAN | 5/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00911 | THE ESTATE OF CAROL HODAPP | 5/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00755 | THE ESTATE OF MATTIE LOVELESS | 5/10/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00868 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES MERKINSON, SR. | 5/10/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00881 | THE ESTATE OF SARA BARTUSCH | 5/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00854 | THE ESTATE OF DOROTHY BRAME | 5/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00804 | THE ESTATE OF CLEMMIE HINES SR | 5/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00877 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH KOELLER | 5/9/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00816 | THE ESTATE OF JANET MOWEN | 5/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00820 | THE ESTATE OF LISA KATZENBACH | 5/8/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00873 | THE ESTATE OF KATHY ADAMS | 5/7/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00809 | THE ESTATE OF BEVERLY DUNSON | 5/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00827 | THE ESTATE OF ANNETTE THOMAS | 5/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00815 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT GIBSON | 5/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00424 | THE ESTATE OF DANIEL STONE | 5/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00837 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM OLIVER SR | 5/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 960, 961, 962 Next |