Daily Law Journal
5563 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVG1300633 GRIMES, DEMETRIUS 5/14/2013
FREEDOM FOR LIFE INVESTMENTS vs GRIMES, DEMETRIUS
CVF1300625 WITTE, JAMIE 5/13/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs WITTE, JAMIE
CVF1300628 MARTIN, CAROL 5/13/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs MARTIN, CAROL
CVG1300626 HAMELIN, CARMEL 5/13/2013
COLLIER, EARL G. vs HAMELIN, CARMEL
CVF1300629 SPOLTMAN, STEVE 5/13/2013
COMPLETE CONSTRUCTION GRP LLC vs SPOLTMAN, STEVE
CVF1300627 SEARCY, JAMES 5/13/2013
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs SEARCY, JAMES
CVH1300621 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 5/10/2013
KELLY, STACY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVG1300624 CHATMAN, HANSFORD SCOTT 5/10/2013
MONG, KRISTIE A. vs CHATMAN, HANSFORD SCOTT
CVF1300622 MARTIN, SCOTT A. 5/10/2013
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC ASSIGNEE OF U.S. BANK vs MARTIN, SCOTT A.
CVI1300620 RON'S AUTO SALES 5/10/2013
SCHACKLEFORD, DIONNE vs RON'S AUTO SALES
CVF1300623 HAINES, BROOKE 5/10/2013
GENERAL ELECTRIC CREDIT UNION vs HAINES, BROOKE
CVF1300614 HALL, ANNA 5/9/2013
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs HALL, ANNA
CVH1300617 RANKIN, MIKE 5/9/2013
BAKUNZI, ARISTIDE vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVG1300612 SMITH, ASHLEY 5/9/2013
NANCY PINARD, LTD. vs SMITH, ASHLEY
CVF1300615 HERNANDEZ, EDGAR 5/9/2013
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO AS SUBROGEE OF DEBORAH MANSON vs HERNANDEZ, EDGAR
CVF1300618 CURTIS, STEVEN 5/9/2013
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-4 vs CURTIS, STEVEN
CVH1300613 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 5/9/2013
MARTIN, RAYMOND vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVG1300616 KING, SILAS 5/9/2013
SELL, RUTH H. vs KING, SILAS
CVE1300619 HOLIHAN, LEO S. 5/8/2013
ATKINS, SAMUEL S. vs HOLIHAN, LEO S.

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 132, 133, 134 ... 277, 278, 279  Next