24883 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2200040 | JENKINS, MICHAEL D | 1/10/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JENKINS, MICHAEL D | |||||||||
CVG2200020 | HARRISON, ANTHONY | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
ARRIVAL HOMES INC FOR: WILLOWWOOD, OWNERS vs HARRISON, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVG2200021 | ANDERSON, GARY | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
DBC REAL ESTATE MGMT LLC STONERIDGE APARTMENTS vs ANDERSON, GARY | |||||||||
CVG2200022 | WILSON, RONNIE | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
POINT MANAGEMENT LLC DBA TOPLAND HOMMES LLC vs WILSON, RONNIE | |||||||||
CVF2200023 | EDWARDS, KIMBERLY J | 1/7/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SER LP vs EDWARDS, KIMBERLY J | |||||||||
CVF2200018 | BRANSCOMB, SANDY | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BRANSCOMB, SANDY | |||||||||
CVG2200019 | FINK, SAMANTHA | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
HOMESMART REALTY/MELANATED VISIONARIES vs FINK, SAMANTHA | |||||||||
CVF2200017 | RALEIGH, DARWIN | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs RALEIGH, DARWIN | |||||||||
CVF2200016 | STALEY, TIMOTHY | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs STALEY, TIMOTHY | |||||||||
CVG2200015 | MILLER, ANGELA | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs MILLER, ANGELA | |||||||||
CVG2200014 | MORROW, ANIKA | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs MORROW, ANIKA | |||||||||
CVG2200013 | REDFORD, DONNIE | 1/6/2022 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs REDFORD, DONNIE | |||||||||
CVF2200010 | BREWER, MARY | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BREWER, MARY | |||||||||
CVF2200011 | TURNER, DIONA | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TURNER, DIONA | |||||||||
CVF2200012 | LLOYD'S ROOFING | 1/4/2022 | |||||||
WEHERLEY, JAMES K vs LLOYD'S ROOFING | |||||||||
CVF2200001 | STRINGER, NANCY K | 1/3/2022 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC CO LPA vs STRINGER, NANCY K | |||||||||
CVF2200002 | ROBINSON, RODRIC | 1/3/2022 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs ROBINSON, RODRIC | |||||||||
CVG2200003 | HIXON, MICHAEL | 1/3/2022 | |||||||
HARBOR GROUP MGMT CO LLC DBA GREENGLEN GARDEN APTS vs HIXON, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVF2200004 | CLINKSCALES, JAYNARD | 1/3/2022 | |||||||
IH CREDIT UNION INC vs CLINKSCALES, JAYNARD | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 281, 282, 283 ... 1243, 1244, 1245 Next |