24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2100965 | FUGATE, STEVEN D | 6/4/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs FUGATE, STEVEN D | |||||||||
CVE2100955 | DESLIPPE, CLARENCE | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INS CO AS SUBR OF JACOB RAYBURN vs DESLIPPE, CLARENCE | |||||||||
CVF2100956 | ADAMS, MONICA | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs ADAMS, MONICA | |||||||||
CVF2100957 | GREENBERG, ZACHARY S | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC F/K/A FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO vs GREENBERG, ZACHARY S | |||||||||
CVF2100958 | BAKER, DEBRA L | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCC IN INT TO TARGET NATIONAL BANK vs BAKER, DEBRA L | |||||||||
CVH2100959 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 6/3/2021 | |||||||
WINDMILLER, DAVID vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF2100953 | ADAMIDIS, GUS | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
REDD, STEPHANIE A vs ADAMIDIS, GUS | |||||||||
CVF2100954 | MARTIN RAN RESTORATIONS, LLC | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
JORDAN, DOUGLAS A vs MARTIN RAN RESTORATIONS, LLC | |||||||||
CVG2100952 | SMITH, MALIYAH | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC AGT FOR 5600 N MAIN vs SMITH, MALIYAH | |||||||||
CVG2100951 | FENTON, DENISE | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP DBA TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS vs FENTON, DENISE | |||||||||
CVG2100950 | COLEMAN, DOMONIQUE | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP DBA TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS vs COLEMAN, DOMONIQUE | |||||||||
CVF2100949 | SOUSOURIS, ATHAN P | 6/2/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs SOUSOURIS, ATHAN P | |||||||||
CVH2100943 | UNION POLICE DEPARTMENT | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
RENTZ, NATASCHA A vs UNION POLICE DEPARTMENT | |||||||||
CVI2100944 | BUCKNER, JASON | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
BRANTLEY, SHALONDA vs BUCKNER, JASON | |||||||||
CVH2100945 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
BOZEMAN, JALENN vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF2100946 | GARDNER, ANTONIO | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs GARDNER, ANTONIO | |||||||||
CVF2100947 | KILBY, DAWN | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs KILBY, DAWN | |||||||||
CVF2100948 | MARTIN, ROSHAWN | 6/1/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs MARTIN, ROSHAWN | |||||||||
CVH2100935 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 5/28/2021 | |||||||
SCOTT, DANIELLE vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 336, 337, 338 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |