24883 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2100821 | POLLARD, GEORGE | 5/14/2021 | |||||||
ROBERTS, TRUSTE, JOHN N vs POLLARD, GEORGE | |||||||||
CVH2100822 | 5/14/2021 | ||||||||
vs | |||||||||
CVH2100820 | REGISTRAR - BMV | 5/14/2021 | |||||||
JONES, BRANDON vs REGISTRAR - BMV | |||||||||
CVF2100791 | FLETCHER, DONNA | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs FLETCHER, DONNA | |||||||||
CVF2100792 | HARRISON LEE, BREANNA R | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY SOUTH vs HARRISON LEE, BREANNA R | |||||||||
CVF2100793 | MCGEE, WILLIE E SR | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
NEWCOMER CREMATIONS FUNERALS & RECEPTIONS vs MCGEE, WILLIE E SR | |||||||||
CVI2100794 | EDWARDS, TIFFANIE MARIKA" " | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
RON'S AUTO SALES vs EDWARDS, TIFFANIE MARIKA" " | |||||||||
CVI2100795 | KINNEY, BRYAN M | 5/13/2021 | |||||||
RON'S AUTO SALES vs KINNEY, BRYAN M | |||||||||
CVG2100790 | LOVATO, CHRISTA | 5/12/2021 | |||||||
ENGLEWOOD VILLAS & RESID LLC vs LOVATO, CHRISTA | |||||||||
CVG2100787 | BROWN, RODRICK | 5/11/2021 | |||||||
WILSON, TYLER vs BROWN, RODRICK | |||||||||
CVF2100789 | SHEPHERD, JEROME | 5/11/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs SHEPHERD, JEROME | |||||||||
CVF2100788 | SULLIVAN, CORRINE | 5/11/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs SULLIVAN, CORRINE | |||||||||
CVG2100786 | JOHNSON, AMANDA | 5/11/2021 | |||||||
HART TIERRAS LLC vs JOHNSON, AMANDA | |||||||||
CVF2100766 | MASTERS, RONALD | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MASTERS, RONALD | |||||||||
CVF2100767 | WHITFIELD, FREDDIE | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
CKS PRIME INVESTMENTS LLC vs WHITFIELD, FREDDIE | |||||||||
CVF2100768 | ALLEN, ANTHONY | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs ALLEN, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVF2100769 | IVORY, KRISTEN | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs IVORY, KRISTEN | |||||||||
CVF2100770 | STONE, ALISA | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs STONE, ALISA | |||||||||
CVF2100771 | ALLEN, JOY M | 5/10/2021 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO LLC FKA FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY vs ALLEN, JOY M | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 347, 348, 349 ... 1243, 1244, 1245 Next |