24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2100012 | BERRY, AUNDREA | 1/6/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LP vs BERRY, AUNDREA | |||||||||
CVG2100013 | CRANFORD, MARY ANN | 1/6/2021 | |||||||
VALLEY REVIVAL PROPERTIES LTD vs CRANFORD, MARY ANN | |||||||||
CVH2100014 | ALKHASAWNEY, SAMIR M | 1/6/2021 | |||||||
EALY, LARRY vs ALKHASAWNEY, SAMIR M | |||||||||
CVG2100011 | LEWIS, AIRIN | 1/6/2021 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LP vs LEWIS, AIRIN | |||||||||
CVG2100009 | GRIFFIN, MICHELLE | 1/5/2021 | |||||||
DAYTONA PARKWAY HOLDINGS LLC DBA DAYTONA VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs GRIFFIN, MICHELLE | |||||||||
CVF2100006 | SANCHEZ, EDSEL EARVIN SALUNGA | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
SNAP-ON CREDIT LLC vs SANCHEZ, EDSEL EARVIN SALUNGA | |||||||||
CVG2100008 | GARRETT, JAMES | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
AGORA REALTY GROUP AGT FOR AGC CONTINENTAL CT LLC vs GARRETT, JAMES | |||||||||
CVF2100007 | KING, CHRISTINA | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
RELIABLE AUTO FINANCE INC vs KING, CHRISTINA | |||||||||
CVF2100005 | EVERETT, ROCHELLE | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
BCG EQUITIES LLC vs EVERETT, ROCHELLE | |||||||||
CVF2100004 | BARBER, CHRISTOPHER | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
BCG EQUITIES LLC vs BARBER, CHRISTOPHER | |||||||||
CVF2100003 | BURCHFIELD, STEPHANIE | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs BURCHFIELD, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVF2100002 | WILLIS, SHERI | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs WILLIS, SHERI | |||||||||
CVF2100001 | JONES, KATHY | 1/4/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs JONES, KATHY | |||||||||
CVF2001940 | RODRIGUEZ, KRISTEN | 12/31/2020 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs RODRIGUEZ, KRISTEN | |||||||||
CVG2001936 | CRANFORD, JUSTIN | 12/30/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs CRANFORD, JUSTIN | |||||||||
CVF2001937 | APPLEGATE, JOSEPH F | 12/30/2020 | |||||||
THE PARK NATIONAL BANK FORMERLY KNOWN AS SECUITY vs APPLEGATE, JOSEPH F | |||||||||
CVE2001938 | FAVORS, TRE MARQUISE | 12/30/2020 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE vs FAVORS, TRE MARQUISE | |||||||||
CVF2001939 | ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY | 12/30/2020 | |||||||
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY vs ROTO-ROOTER SERVICES COMPANY | |||||||||
CVG2001934 | HILLS, IREALE | 12/29/2020 | |||||||
L & T HOME RENTALS vs HILLS, IREALE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 385, 386, 387 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |