24763 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2001697 | SEAGRAVES, BRANDON | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC vs SEAGRAVES, BRANDON | |||||||||
CVG2001698 | WRIGHT, CHRISTOPHER | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
ARCH CITY REALTY GROUP LLC vs WRIGHT, CHRISTOPHER | |||||||||
CVF2001696 | PRYOR, TOIYA S | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs PRYOR, TOIYA S | |||||||||
CVF2001593 | ZIMMERMAN, KIMBERLY | 10/30/2020 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CTR LLC vs ZIMMERMAN, KIMBERLY | |||||||||
CVF2001594 | MUHUZA, AIMABLE | 10/30/2020 | |||||||
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs MUHUZA, AIMABLE | |||||||||
CVI2001589 | CRUMBLE, NICOLE | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
RODDY, MARQUITA vs CRUMBLE, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVH2001592 | ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
LEWIS, TERRY vs ANIMAL RESOURCE CENTER | |||||||||
CVF2001591 | POFFENBERGER, CLINT | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs POFFENBERGER, CLINT | |||||||||
CVH2001590 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
MOORE, RYAN vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVF2001588 | ALEXANDER, LEJON | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
M. SANJEEVAN, vs ALEXANDER, LEJON | |||||||||
CVF2001587 | JOHNSON, TEISHA M | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
M. SANJEEVAN, vs JOHNSON, TEISHA M | |||||||||
CVF2001586 | MAYFIELD, VALERIE L | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
M. SANJEEVAN, vs MAYFIELD, VALERIE L | |||||||||
CVF2001585 | CARPENTER, AMY | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs CARPENTER, AMY | |||||||||
CVF2001584 | HOWARD, JEFFREY | 10/29/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OH vs HOWARD, JEFFREY | |||||||||
CVF2001580 | SCOTT, STACY J | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FIN GRP LLC SUC BY MERGER TO SPRINGLEAF FIN SVCS vs SCOTT, STACY J | |||||||||
CVG2001581 | RUFFIN, JAMEISA | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
RESTORATION HOUSING LLC vs RUFFIN, JAMEISA | |||||||||
CVG2001582 | STAFFORD, ALEXUS | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
HILL, GORDON E vs STAFFORD, ALEXUS | |||||||||
CVG2001583 | SIMS, KEI'SEAN | 10/28/2020 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP vs SIMS, KEI'SEAN | |||||||||
CVF2001578 | FOSTER, MICHAEL | 10/27/2020 | |||||||
TC INVESTMENTS LLC vs FOSTER, MICHAEL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 396, 397, 398 ... 1237, 1238, 1239 Next |