24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2001081 | MCKNIGHT, MICHAEL | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs MCKNIGHT, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVF2001082 | TULL, LISA | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs TULL, LISA | |||||||||
CVF2001083 | KILBY, DAWN | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs KILBY, DAWN | |||||||||
CVF2001084 | HORSTMAN, STEVEN | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs HORSTMAN, STEVEN | |||||||||
CVF2001080 | DAVENPORT, MELISSA W | 7/23/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs DAVENPORT, MELISSA W | |||||||||
CVG2001074 | BRINNON, TIMOTHY | 7/22/2020 | |||||||
FRYMAN, SHERRY L vs BRINNON, TIMOTHY | |||||||||
CVF2001075 | WRIGHT, WILLIAM D | 7/22/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs WRIGHT, WILLIAM D | |||||||||
CVG2001073 | ROWLEY, CATRINA | 7/21/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS AND vs ROWLEY, CATRINA | |||||||||
CVF2001067 | SENG, JOSEPH | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
CADENCE DENTAL GROUP vs SENG, JOSEPH | |||||||||
CVF2001072 | RAAB, KRISTENA R | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INV LLC vs RAAB, KRISTENA R | |||||||||
CVG2001071 | ROSS, KENNY | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
PCHH PROPERTIES LLC vs ROSS, KENNY | |||||||||
CVG2001070 | HOWE, CRYSTAL | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES MHP LLC vs HOWE, CRYSTAL | |||||||||
CVG2001069 | TAYLOR, TIA | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs TAYLOR, TIA | |||||||||
CVF2001068 | KNEPPER, JEWELS | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
NANCY PINARD LTD DBA FOXBORO ARMS APARTMENTS vs KNEPPER, JEWELS | |||||||||
CVE2001066 | THORPE, BRIAN ALAN | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INS CO vs THORPE, BRIAN ALAN | |||||||||
CVH2001065 | CITY OF UNION POLICE | 7/20/2020 | |||||||
WASHINGTON, NATALIE vs CITY OF UNION POLICE | |||||||||
CVG2001061 | MARTIN, INDIA | 7/17/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs MARTIN, INDIA | |||||||||
CVG2001062 | LONG, SHELESA | 7/17/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC AGENT FOR vs LONG, SHELESA | |||||||||
CVG2001063 | COLLIER, CARLTON | 7/17/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC AGENT FOR vs COLLIER, CARLTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 424, 425, 426 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |