24883 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2001124 | BURNSIDE, STEPHEN JR | 8/3/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs BURNSIDE, STEPHEN JR | |||||||||
CVI2001125 | MONMOUTH, RAYNARD | 8/3/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS, ROBERT A vs MONMOUTH, RAYNARD | |||||||||
CVG2001126 | GILBERT, DANE | 8/3/2020 | |||||||
NANCY PINARD LTD RONALD PINARD/LANDLORD vs GILBERT, DANE | |||||||||
CVG2001123 | MOORE, SHAINA | 8/3/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs MOORE, SHAINA | |||||||||
CVI2001109 | BELL, KAYLA R | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
TERRELL, RALF vs BELL, KAYLA R | |||||||||
CVI2001110 | BELL, ANGELA C | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
TERRELL, RALF vs BELL, ANGELA C | |||||||||
CVF2001111 | DAHM, JENNIE L | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC D/B/A KAY JEWELERS vs DAHM, JENNIE L | |||||||||
CVF2001112 | KELLY, MARQUES | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs KELLY, MARQUES | |||||||||
CVF2001113 | CVETNIC, TAMMI | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs CVETNIC, TAMMI | |||||||||
CVF2001107 | ASHCRAFT, BETH | 7/30/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs ASHCRAFT, BETH | |||||||||
CVI2001108 | VAUGHT, RACHELLE | 7/30/2020 | |||||||
BENNETT, CHEVELLE vs VAUGHT, RACHELLE | |||||||||
CVG2001106 | TAYLOR, KEITH | 7/30/2020 | |||||||
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT DBA CEDARGATE APARTMENTS vs TAYLOR, KEITH | |||||||||
CVF2001104 | HAYNES, ROBERT T | 7/29/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs HAYNES, ROBERT T | |||||||||
CVI2001105 | AUTO OWNER'S INSURANCE | 7/29/2020 | |||||||
DUVERGLAS, DARRYL G SR vs AUTO OWNER'S INSURANCE | |||||||||
CVG2001103 | HENDERSON, TIFFANY | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
JONES, RICKY vs HENDERSON, TIFFANY | |||||||||
CVF2001088 | EVANS, MICHAEL D | 7/27/2020 | |||||||
UC HEALTH vs EVANS, MICHAEL D | |||||||||
CVE2001089 | EDGERTON, TEVIN LATONE | 7/27/2020 | |||||||
FIRST ACCEPTANCE SERVICES INC vs EDGERTON, TEVIN LATONE | |||||||||
CVG2001090 | SMITH, SARA | 7/27/2020 | |||||||
SCHINDLER, THOMAS vs SMITH, SARA | |||||||||
CVF2001091 | DAVIS, DERICK | 7/27/2020 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO vs DAVIS, DERICK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 425, 426, 427 ... 1243, 1244, 1245 Next |