24680 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2000716 | MARBURY, MARQUEZ | 5/1/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MARBURY, MARQUEZ | |||||||||
CVF2000707 | COMBS, MISTY L | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs COMBS, MISTY L | |||||||||
CVF2000708 | JONES, MARILYN | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs JONES, MARILYN | |||||||||
CVF2000709 | DIVIAK, BRITTANY | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs DIVIAK, BRITTANY | |||||||||
CVF2000710 | MORRIS, YOLANDA | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs MORRIS, YOLANDA | |||||||||
CVF2000711 | JAMAL, SAGAL | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs JAMAL, SAGAL | |||||||||
CVF2000712 | SMITH, KODI L | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs SMITH, KODI L | |||||||||
CVF2000713 | ISREAL, LARON | 4/30/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs ISREAL, LARON | |||||||||
CVG2000705 | VALLIE, AUTUMN | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS AND vs VALLIE, AUTUMN | |||||||||
CVG2000706 | EDWARDS, DANYELLE | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
BWB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs EDWARDS, DANYELLE | |||||||||
CVG2000704 | PRINTUP, CARLA | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS vs PRINTUP, CARLA | |||||||||
CVG2000703 | WALKER, NANCY | 4/29/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TM AGT FOR 5600 N MAIN ST LLC vs WALKER, NANCY | |||||||||
CVE2000702 | SMITH, JAMAAL RAYMOND | 4/28/2020 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE vs SMITH, JAMAAL RAYMOND | |||||||||
CVG2000690 | KNOLTON, TONI | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
COMTECH REALTY LLC AGENT FOR C & D REALTY LLC vs KNOLTON, TONI | |||||||||
CVG2000691 | SMITH, ANTONIA M | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs SMITH, ANTONIA M | |||||||||
CVG2000692 | REESE, LATARSHA | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs REESE, LATARSHA | |||||||||
CVG2000693 | WATTS, TANEISHA | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs WATTS, TANEISHA | |||||||||
CVG2000694 | HARRIS, TEQUITA | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
GOLD COAST REALTY COMPANY vs HARRIS, TEQUITA | |||||||||
CVG2000695 | CONNER, JANELL | 4/27/2020 | |||||||
GOLD COAST REALTY COMPANY vs CONNER, JANELL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 430, 431, 432 ... 1232, 1233, 1234 Next |