24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2000655 | LITTLETON, TAMMY | 4/17/2020 | |||||||
JOSEPH C LUCAS, TRUSTEE vs LITTLETON, TAMMY | |||||||||
CVG2000654 | EDWARDS, DANYELLE | 4/17/2020 | |||||||
BWB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs EDWARDS, DANYELLE | |||||||||
CVF2000652 | KAISER, ANDREW P | 4/16/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs KAISER, ANDREW P | |||||||||
CVI2000647 | ENTERPRISE RENTALS | 4/15/2020 | |||||||
HOLDERMAN, DIANA vs ENTERPRISE RENTALS | |||||||||
CVF2000648 | KNIGHT, LAKIESHA | 4/15/2020 | |||||||
GATEWAY FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO LPA vs KNIGHT, LAKIESHA | |||||||||
CVF2000649 | RICHARDSON, DOMONICK | 4/15/2020 | |||||||
GATEWAY FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO LPA vs RICHARDSON, DOMONIC... | |||||||||
CVF2000650 | OWENS, MARK | 4/15/2020 | |||||||
GATEWAY FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO LPA vs OWENS, MARK | |||||||||
CVF2000651 | FOSTER, MICHAEL | 4/15/2020 | |||||||
TC INVESTMENTS LLC vs FOSTER, MICHAEL | |||||||||
CVF2000642 | TAYLOR, MELISSA | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INV LLC ASGN OF CITIBANK NA vs TAYLOR, MELISSA | |||||||||
CVF2000646 | ECKLEY, LOUIS | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs ECKLEY, LOUIS | |||||||||
CVF2000645 | THOMAS, TINA M | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs THOMAS, TINA M | |||||||||
CVF2000644 | MITCHELL, MARK | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs MITCHELL, MARK | |||||||||
CVF2000643 | BOESENBERG, AMANDA | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs BOESENBERG, AMANDA | |||||||||
CVG2000641 | CUPP, PATRICIA | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
PRINCETON MGMT AGT FOR BROOKVIEW PLACE OWNER vs CUPP, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVH2000640 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 4/13/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS, JAMES R vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF2000636 | WILSON, MARKEI | 4/10/2020 | |||||||
GATEWAY FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS vs WILSON, MARKEI | |||||||||
CVF2000637 | MARTIN, WESLEY J | 4/10/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MARTIN, WESLEY J | |||||||||
CVG2000638 | WILKINS, SONNIE | 4/10/2020 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS,LP vs WILKINS, SONNIE | |||||||||
CVG2000639 | BERRY, AUNDREA | 4/10/2020 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS, LP vs BERRY, AUNDREA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 441, 442, 443 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |