24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2000011 | SIMS, AIMEE | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
AGORA REALTY GROUP LLC AGENT FOR OWNER vs SIMS, AIMEE | |||||||||
CVF2000010 | BOLDMAN, CHRISTOPHER | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION DBA ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES vs BOLDMAN, CHRISTOPHER | |||||||||
CVG1902636 | CLAY, MARIE | 12/31/2019 | |||||||
DBC REAL ESTATE MGMT, LLC vs CLAY, MARIE | |||||||||
CVH1902637 | PLATFOOT, DAVE | 12/31/2019 | |||||||
PALMER, LE SAUNDRA vs PLATFOOT, DAVE | |||||||||
CVG1902638 | TURNER, PAMELA | 12/31/2019 | |||||||
KLOS, MICHAEL vs TURNER, PAMELA | |||||||||
CVH1902639 | MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL | 12/31/2019 | |||||||
CHAMBERS, DEVON vs MONTGOMERY COUNTY ANIMAL | |||||||||
CVF1902632 | MCINTURFF, AMANDA M | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs MCINTURFF, AMANDA M | |||||||||
CVG1902635 | OWENS, MARK | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
CATALPA PARTNERS LLC vs OWENS, MARK | |||||||||
CVI1902634 | RUF, MARSHA | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
MILSTEAD, GREGORY vs RUF, MARSHA | |||||||||
CVF1902633 | BUELOW, ROY T | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BUELOW, ROY T | |||||||||
CVF1902631 | ARTKAMP, KRISTIN E | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs ARTKAMP, KRISTIN E | |||||||||
CVF1902630 | MCGUIRE, JAZZMINE | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs MCGUIRE, JAZZMINE | |||||||||
CVF1902629 | NETH, THOMAS E | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMEN LLC,ASSIGNEE OF ICON EQUITIES vs NETH, THOMAS E | |||||||||
CVF1902628 | STEWART, JOAN | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs STEWART, JOAN | |||||||||
CVI1902625 | MEADOWS OF CATALPA | 12/27/2019 | |||||||
HANCOCK, LATICKA A R vs MEADOWS OF CATALPA | |||||||||
CVG1902626 | GIST, JOCELYN | 12/27/2019 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs GIST, JOCELYN | |||||||||
CVG1902627 | HANCOCK, LATICKA | 12/27/2019 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs HANCOCK, LATICKA | |||||||||
CVG1902613 | SMITH, CHINEICE | 12/26/2019 | |||||||
TIMBERLAKE LP DBA TIMBERLAKE APARTMENTS vs SMITH, CHINEICE | |||||||||
CVG1902614 | HARRIS, MAURICE | 12/26/2019 | |||||||
DAYTON CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS LP DBA CARRIAGE HOUSE APTS vs HARRIS, MAURICE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 469, 470, 471 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |