ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
OCTOBER 13, 2015 AT 10:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
Andrew Engel, Andrew Engel
Docket History
8/6/2015
ORDER SETTING HEARING
AUGUST 11, 2015 AT 2:00 PM
7/15/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
AUGUST 4, 2015 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
8/15/2013
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION OF HARI PALIATH FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
5/30/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT HARI PALIATH'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT ON JUNE 11, 2013 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM NO. 11
5/22/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
8/15/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ALLOWING COUNSEL TO VIEW EXHIBITS
8/3/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING THOMAS PYPER PERMISSION TO VIEW EXHIBITS
7/13/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING TWO WEEK EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT, HARI PALIATH'S, MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
3/21/2012
ORDER REQUIRING BANKRUPTCY TRUSTEE TO TURN OVER TAX RETURNS TO ATTY
3/8/2012
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
1/20/2012
Order setting briefing schedule submission date of Feb 3