ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE
5/16/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE
5/13/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
2/27/2013
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
1/7/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENTS ON ITS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
10/10/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 10/18/12 AT 9:15 A.M.
8/22/2012
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROBERTH ARRIS RELATING TO TRUCK MANEUVERABILITYOR OTHER TRAFFIC ENGINEERING ISSUES
8/22/2012
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL MATERIALS
8/22/2012
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING IN PART AND SUSTAINING IN PART MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CORRESPONDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN HILGEMAN
8/22/2012
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF ROBERT HARRIS
5/11/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
3/15/2012
ORDER: PROPOSED AGREED ENTRY EXTENDING DEADLINE
2/13/2012
Order: entry & order granting plaintiff's motion for leave to amend disclosure of expert witnesses
2/10/2012
Entry signed by Judge
12/21/2011
Order: Final pretrial order
11/9/2011
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON 12/21/11 AT 8:45 A.M.
11/8/2011
Decision & Entry OVERRULING Defendant's Motion for reconsideration of Summary Judgment and setting telephone settlement conference