Case Information
7/29/2014
2010CV06661
Common Pleas
Pnc Bank National Association
Brian A Haynes
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTING SALE PROCEEDS
Christopher Schwieterman
Docket History
7/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTING SALE PROCEEDS
1/10/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
1/10/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
12/26/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY SARA PETERSMANN
10/16/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
9/24/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY SARA PETERSMANN
5/17/2012
ORDER WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/14/2012
NOTICE SHERIFF SALE