Docket History
1/2/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
10/18/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
10/17/2013
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO STAY SHERIFF'S SALE
10/8/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY SARA PETERSMANN
7/8/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFFS SALE
1/4/2013
DECISION
OVERRULING MOTION TO STAY SHERIFF?S SALE
9/7/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 11/27/2012 @ 9:30 A.M.
5/30/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 7/19/2012 @ 9:00 A.M.
4/9/2012
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/29/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE 5-24-12
3/20/2012
Order Setting Briefing Schedule Submission Date of 3-29-12
2/28/2012
Order setting status conference by telephone on March 27
2/2/2012
order setting status conference by telephone on 2/28/12 @ 9:30 a.m.
10/3/2011
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE ON 11/29/11