Docket History
7/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
4/7/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 5-23-14 FILED BY Jillian Henzler
11/12/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 12-20-2013
9/20/2012
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ORDER WITHDRAWING SHERIFF SALE
8/29/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SHERIFF SALE FILED BY Matthew Murtland
5/16/2012
NOTICE: Dismissal – Failure to Prosecute Filed
3/16/2012
ORDER: CONTINUE
3/14/2012
NOTICE: File Default Motion Within 14 Days
2/2/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE