ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #17 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME NUNC PRO TUNC TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES ON AUGUST 28, 2014.
Dwight Brannon, Dwight Brannon
Docket History
8/7/2014
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY SHANNON BOCKELMAN
8/7/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #17 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME NUNC PRO TUNC TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES ON AUGUST 28, 2014.
8/7/2014
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY SHANNON BOCKELMAN
8/7/2014
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY SHANNON BOCKELMAN
7/7/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON JULY 24, 2014.
7/7/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON JULY 24, 2014.
6/2/2014
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
OF DEFENDANT MARK SMITH FILED BY DWIGHT BRANNON
6/2/2014
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
OF DEFENDANT MARK SMITH FILED BY DWIGHT BRANNON
5/8/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITH PREJUDICE
BY PLAINTIFFS GEORGE AND FLORICE WILLIAMS FILED BY SHANNON BOCKELMAN
11/20/2013
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
PLAINTIFF JANIS LOWERY'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY DWIGHT BRANNON
11/14/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 12-13-13 @ 9:00 A.M.
10/10/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
FOR AMOS PLAINTIFFS MOTION #12 FOR LEAVE TO FILE IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT
8/9/2013
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
ORDER AND ENTRY REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY MVH FOR WHICH THE PEER REVIEW PRIVILEGE IS ASSERTED
6/18/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
5/21/2013
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
ORDER AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION OF THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY TO INTERVENE
5/15/2013
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY OVERRULING CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENTS FOR ITS MOTION TO INTERVENE
3/6/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
AND ENTRY ESTABLISHING WITNESS DISCLOSURE DEADLINES AND SETTING TELECONFERENCE TO DISCUSS MEDIATION RELATED ISSUES
11/2/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ENTRY GRANTING THE HOSPITAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMOS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #7 MOTION TO COMPEL TESTIMONY AND MATERIALS OF TIM KEANE
6/19/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM (AMOS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #3)
3/15/2012
ORDER: CONSOLIDATE CASE(S)
3/8/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
3/2/2012
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
2/23/2012
ORDER AND ENTRY CONCERNING POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION