Case Information
7/22/2014
2012CV02220
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association
Lashonda Baker
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
AND VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
Erin Laurito
Docket History
5/16/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
2/19/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
2012 CV 02220
10/30/2012
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
2012 CV 02220
5/17/2012
Judgment Entry and Foreclosure Decree
5/2/2012
NOTICE: File Default Motion Within 14 Days
3/23/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE