Docket History
8/14/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 FILED BY JENNIFER TEMPLETON
8/14/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 FILED BY JENNIFER TEMPLETON
8/22/2013
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
1/25/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 13, 2013 AT 845AM
1/9/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
12/27/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
11/16/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
10/25/2012
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OR TO DISMISS
8/20/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER
7/6/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE