Docket History
7/7/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
6/11/2014
DECISION
OVERRULING THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, TALBOT D. ZIEGLER AND ANGELA ZIEGLER, FOR A STAY OF EXECUTION
6/11/2014
DECISION
OVERRULING THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, TALBOT D. ZIEGLER AND ANGELA ZIEGLER, FOR A STAY OF EXECUTION
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 27, 2014 FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 27, 2014 FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
11/14/2013
DECISION
ENTRY AND ORDER SETTING SUPERSEDEAS BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $20,000.00
10/22/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
3/4/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMISSION ON 3/26/13; RESPONSE DUE 3/18/13; REPLY DUE 3/25/13
1/29/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE 2/12/13 AT 8:30 A.M.
12/7/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 1-8-13 AT 8:30 A.M.
9/18/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 11-27-12 AT 8:30 A.M.
8/28/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS ON 9-13-12 AT 8:30 A.M.
7/30/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE