ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS (AMENDED)
Matthew Gladwell
Docket History
9/12/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS (AMENDED)
2/28/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS
2/28/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS
11/4/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
7/29/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW
PRECIPE FOR ORDER OF SALE
5/7/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/29/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 05, 2013 AT 9:00 AM
11/28/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 29, 2013 AT 9:00 AM
11/5/2012
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE NOVEMBER 19, 2012 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE NOVEMBER 26, 2012
10/10/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON NOVEMBER 27, 2012 AT 9:15 AM
9/26/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
DEFAULT