Case Information
4/21/2014
2012CV07250
Common Pleas
General Electric Credit Union
Mark A Stapleton
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
OF CROSS-CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY AUSTIN BARNES III
William Fecher
Docket History
4/21/2014
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
OF CROSS-CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY AUSTIN BARNES III
7/23/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY WILLIAM FECHER
5/7/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
12/3/2012
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
CASE DISMISSED
11/14/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
ON MARK A. STAPLETON AND VICKIE L. STRINGER