ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS
Kevin Williams
Docket History
11/14/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY KEVIN WILLIAMS
7/1/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW
ALLOWING DEFENDANT, WANDA S. DILL, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF SARAH E. WELLS TO WITHDRAW HER MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ALLOW TO FILE AN ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OUT OF TIME
5/29/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
RESCHEDULING HEARING FROM JUNE 07, 2013 TO JULY 05, 2013 AT 10:00 AM
5/21/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT IN COURTROOM NO.7 ON JUNE 07, 2013
2/8/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
1/31/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE