Docket History
5/27/2016
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
5/6/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
12 CV 7505
5/6/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
12 CV 7505
5/6/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
12 CV 7505
5/6/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
12 CV 7505
6/6/2013
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
4/5/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 05/03/2013 AT 10AM FILED BY JENNIFER HELLER
12/31/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
10/18/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE