NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 31, 2014 FILED BY KEVIN WILLIAMS
Kevin Williams
Docket History
9/12/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 31, 2014 FILED BY KEVIN WILLIAMS
2/6/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
2/6/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
2/6/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
2/6/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
1/17/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 19, 2013 AT 9:00 AM
1/4/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JANUARY 17, 2013 AND MOVANT'S REPLY DUE JANUARY 24, 2013
11/30/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 16, 2013 AT 9:15 AM