Docket History
9/12/2014
ORDER: 41A DISMISSAL
WITH PREJUDICE JOINT STIPULATION
8/12/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
RESCHEDULED FROM AUGUST 14, 2014 TO OCTOBER 16, 2014 AT 11:00 A.M.
4/22/2014
DECISION
ORDER, AND ENTRY SUSTAINING MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS FEE
4/22/2014
DECISION
ORDER, AND ENTRY SUSTAINING MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS FEE
1/25/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 27, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/2/2013
CIVIL ALL OTHER