Docket History
7/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
1/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY Jillian Henzler
1/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY Jillian Henzler
10/23/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
8/8/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS
5/3/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 23, 2013 AT 9:15 AM
2/14/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE