Docket History
4/14/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
4/14/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
4/14/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
8/4/2015
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
9/12/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 11/7/14 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
9/12/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 11/7/14 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
1/28/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ORDER TO CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
1/28/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ORDER TO CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
1/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
1/16/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
4/23/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
2/22/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE