Docket History
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION
6/19/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE DECISION
2/19/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
13 CV 1321
12/3/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
9/13/2013
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
8/19/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
S51
7/3/2013
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN CASE
6/17/2013
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
5/30/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.