Case Information
7/30/2014
2013CV01972
Common Pleas
Harley Shepherd
Montgomery County Dept Environmental Services
DECISION
ORDER, AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
David Duwel
Docket History
7/30/2014
DECISION
ORDER, AND ENTRY SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
11/18/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON JANUARY 31, 2014 AT 845AM
10/28/2013
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
8/22/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME
6/11/2013
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE AND FINDING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS