Docket History
8/22/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
4/3/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 4-25-14 FILED BY PETER MEHLER
4/3/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 4-25-14 FILED BY PETER MEHLER
10/31/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NOVEMBER 21, 2013.
8/19/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 9/9/13 AT 10:00 A.M.
7/17/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE SET FOR 8/16/13 AT 11:30 A.M.
7/15/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JULY 17, 2013 AT 10:00 A.M.
6/20/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS.
4/17/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE