Docket History
7/29/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 22, 2014 FILED BY MATTHEW GLADWELL
2/25/2014
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
2/25/2014
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
12/14/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 1/2/2014 @ 10:00 A.M.
8/22/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
7/31/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 9/5/2013 @ 9:45 A.M.
7/9/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 7/30/2013 @ 9:45 A.M.
6/27/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/21/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE