Case Information
8/25/2014
2013CV04383
Common Pleas
Terry Cammack
Greater Dayton Regional Transit Authority
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY DAVID DUWEL
David Duwel
Docket History
8/25/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY DAVID DUWEL
7/30/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
7/30/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
5/28/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 16, 2014
5/28/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 16, 2014
5/28/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 16, 2014
5/28/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 16, 2014
7/24/2013
CIVIL ALL OTHER